# Always Nine

## Always Nine

Very Interesting Number Nine   Two Numbers (10 a+b) and (10 x+y) For two digits numbers, numbers can be written in four ways like this 1. (10 a+b) and (10 x+y) 2. (10 a+b) and (10 y+x) 3. (10 b+a) and (10 x+y) 4. (10 b+a) and (10 y+x) Multiple with each other  (10 a+b)*(10 x+y) = 100 ax + 10 bx + 10 ay +by  (10 a+b)*(10 y+x) = 100 ay + 10 by + 10 ax + x b  (10 b+a)*(10 x+y) = 100 bx + 10 ax + 10 by + a y  (10 b+a)*(10 y+x) = 100 by + 10 ay + 10 bx + ax Subtract each one respectively 1.100 ax +10 bx + 10 a y + by - 100 a y - 10 by- 10 ax - x b        = 90 ax + 9 bx -      90 a y – 9 by = 9(10 ax+bx-10 a y- by) 2.100 ax +10 bx + 10 ay + by – 100 bx – 10 ax- 10 by - a y       = 90 ax - 90 bx      -9 a y – 9 by = 9(10 ax-10 bx- a y-by) 3.100 ax +10 bx + 10 a y + by – 100 by – 10 a y- 10 bx - ax       = 99 ax – 99 by     = 9(11 ax -11 by) 4.100 a y + 10 by + 10 ax + x b -100 bx - 10 ax -10 by –a y        = 99 ay -99bx =       9(11 a y-11 b x) 5.100 a y + 10 by + 10 a x + x b -100 by - 10 a y -10 b x –ax    = 90 a y -90 by+     9 ax -9 x b = 9(10 a y-10 by +ax –x b) For example 25 & 32, we can write them in four ways like 25, 32, 52 and 23and now multiple with each other  like this (25*32),(25*23),(52*32) and (52*23) 25*32=800 25*23=575 52*32=1664 52*23=1196 1664 – 1196 = 468 =4+6+8 =18 =1+8=9 1664 – 800 = 864 =8+6+4 =18 =1+8=9 1664 – 575 = 1089=1+0+8+9=18 =1+8=9 1196 – 800 = 396 =3+9+6 =18 =1+8=9 1196 – 575 = 621 =6+2+1=9 800 – 575 = 225 =2+2+5=9   Nine always Remain   Copyrighted(piyushgoel)